Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021