Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021