Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 18, 2021