Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB300 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021