Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB302 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021