Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2021