Senate | 04/27/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Manger | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Ranson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Jech |