Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021