House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |