Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB332 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44 Req. No. 1261 Page 1 1
55 2
66 3
77 4
88 5
99 6
1010 7
1111 8
1212 9
1313 10
1414 11
1515 12
1616 13
1717 14
1818 15
1919 16
2020 17
2121 18
2222 19
2323 20
2424 21
2525 22
2626 23
2727 24
2828 1
2929 2
3030 3
3131 4
3232 5
3333 6
3434 7
3535 8
3636 9
3737 10
3838 11
3939 12
4040 13
4141 14
4242 15
4343 16
4444 17
4545 18
4646 19
4747 20
4848 21
4949 22
5050 23
5151 24
5252
5353 STATE OF OKLAHOMA
5454
5555 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021)
5656
5757 SENATE BILL 332 By: Boren
5858
5959
6060
6161
6262
6363 AS INTRODUCED
6464
6565 An Act relating to minimum wage; amending 40 O.S.
6666 2011, Sections 197.2, 197.3 and 197.5, which relate
6767 to minimum wage, Commissioner of Labor, and employees
6868 covered by the Oklahoma Minimum Wage Act; deleting
6969 language; modifying references; changing from federal
7070 minimum wage to a state minimum wage; dire cting the
7171 Commissioner of Labor to enfo rce state minimum wage;
7272 establishing a schedule of minimum wage increases;
7373 tying minimum wage to Consumer Price Index after
7474 certain date; providing an effective date; and
7575 declaring an emergency.
7676
7777
7878
7979
8080
8181 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA:
8282 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 40 O.S. 2011, Section 197.2, is
8383 amended to read as follows:
8484 Section 197.2. It shall be unlawful to employ workers in any
8585 industry or occupation within the State of Oklahoma under conditions
8686 of labor detrimental to their health or moral s and it shall be
8787 unlawful to employ workers in any indu stry within the State of
8888 Oklahoma at wages which are not adequate for their maintenance .
8989 Except as otherwise provided in the Oklahoma Minimu m Wage Act, no
9090 employer within the State of Oklahoma shall pay any employee a wage
9191
9292
9393 Req. No. 1261 Page 2 1
9494 2
9595 3
9696 4
9797 5
9898 6
9999 7
100100 8
101101 9
102102 10
103103 11
104104 12
105105 13
106106 14
107107 15
108108 16
109109 17
110110 18
111111 19
112112 20
113113 21
114114 22
115115 23
116116 24
117117 1
118118 2
119119 3
120120 4
121121 5
122122 6
123123 7
124124 8
125125 9
126126 10
127127 11
128128 12
129129 13
130130 14
131131 15
132132 16
133133 17
134134 18
135135 19
136136 20
137137 21
138138 22
139139 23
140140 24
141141
142142 of less than the current federal state minimum wage for all hours
143143 worked.
144144 SECTION 2. AMENDATORY 40 O.S. 2011, Section 197.3, is
145145 amended to read as follows:
146146 Section 197.3. A. The Wage and Hour Commission is hereb y
147147 terminated and all powers and duties of such Commission are
148148 transferred to the Commissioner of Labor. All personnel, funds,
149149 financial obligations and encumbrances, records, e quipment,
150150 furniture, fixtures, files and s upplies under the control of the
151151 Wage and Hour Commission are transferred to the Commissioner of
152152 Labor as of the effective date of this act on July 1, 1978.
153153 B. The Commissioner of Labor shall establish, pursuant t o this
154154 act, such enforce standards of this state’s minimum wages and
155155 establish conditions of labor for employees within the State of
156156 Oklahoma as shall be reasonable and not detrimental to health and
157157 morals.
158158 SECTION 3. AMENDATORY 40 O.S. 2011, Section 197.5, is
159159 amended to read as follows:
160160 Section 197.5. Every employer shall pay to each of his or her
161161 employees who have reached eighteen (18) years of age wages at a
162162 rate of not less than Two Dollars ($2.00) the federal minimum wa ge
163163 of Seven Dollars and twenty-five cents ($7.25) per hour on January
164164 1, 2021, until December 31, 2021. Regardless of other provisions of
165165 the Oklahoma Minimum Wage Act, every Beginning January 1, 2022, the
166166
167167
168168 Req. No. 1261 Page 3 1
169169 2
170170 3
171171 4
172172 5
173173 6
174174 7
175175 8
176176 9
177177 10
178178 11
179179 12
180180 13
181181 14
182182 15
183183 16
184184 17
185185 18
186186 19
187187 20
188188 21
189189 22
190190 23
191191 24
192192 1
193193 2
194194 3
195195 4
196196 5
197197 6
198198 7
199199 8
200200 9
201201 10
202202 11
203203 12
204204 13
205205 14
206206 15
207207 16
208208 17
209209 18
210210 19
211211 20
212212 21
213213 22
214214 23
215215 24
216216
217217 state minimum wage shall be Eight Dollars and fifty cents ( $8.50)
218218 per hour. Beginning on Janua ry 1, 2023, the state minimum wage
219219 shall be Nine Dollars and seventy-five cents ($9.75) per hour.
220220 Beginning on January 1, 2024, the state minimum wage shall be Eleven
221221 Dollars ($11.00) per hour. Beginning January 1, 2025, the state
222222 minimum wage shall be Thirteen Dollars ($13.00) per hour. Beginning
223223 January 1, 2026, the state minimum wage shall be Fifteen Dollars
224224 ($15.00) per hour. Beginning on January 1, 2027, and every January
225225 1 thereafter, the state minimum wage shall increase according to the
226226 Consumer Price Index (CPI) percentage increase from the prior year.
227227 Every employee of the State of Oklahoma or any lessee or
228228 concessionaire thereof is hereby specifically covered by the
229229 Oklahoma Minimum Wage Act and the minimum wage per hour set by this
230230 section.
231231 SECTION 4. This act shall become effe ctive July 1, 2021.
232232 SECTION 5. It being immediately necessary for the pr eservation
233233 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
234234 declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and
235235 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
236236
237237 58-1-1261 1/11/2021 9:33:06 AM