Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB332 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/11/2021

                             
 
 
Req. No. 1261 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 332  By: Boren 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to minimum wage; amending 40 O.S. 
2011, Sections 197.2, 197.3 and 197.5, which relate 
to minimum wage, Commissioner of Labor, and employees 
covered by the Oklahoma Minimum Wage Act; deleting 
language; modifying references; changing from federal 
minimum wage to a state minimum wage; dire cting the 
Commissioner of Labor to enfo rce state minimum wage; 
establishing a schedule of minimum wage increases; 
tying minimum wage to Consumer Price Index after 
certain date; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA: 
SECTION 1.    AMENDATORY     40 O.S. 2011, Section 197.2, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 197.2. It shall be unlawful to employ workers in any 
industry or occupation within the State of Oklahoma under conditions 
of labor detrimental to their health or moral s and it shall be 
unlawful to employ workers in any indu stry within the State of 
Oklahoma at wages which are not adequate for their maintenance .  
Except as otherwise provided in the Oklahoma Minimu m Wage Act, no 
employer within the State of Oklahoma shall pay any employee a wage   
 
 
Req. No. 1261 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
of less than the current federal state minimum wage for all hours 
worked. 
SECTION 2.    AMENDATORY     40 O.S. 2011, Section 197.3, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 197.3. A.  The Wage and Hour Commission is hereb y 
terminated and all powers and duties of such Commission are 
transferred to the Commissioner of Labor.  All personnel, funds, 
financial obligations and encumbrances, records, e quipment, 
furniture, fixtures, files and s upplies under the control of the 
Wage and Hour Commission are transferred to the Commissioner of 
Labor as of the effective date of this act on July 1, 1978. 
B.  The Commissioner of Labor shall establish, pursuant t o this 
act, such enforce standards of this state’s minimum wages and 
establish conditions of labor for employees within the State of 
Oklahoma as shall be reasonable and not detrimental to health and 
morals. 
SECTION 3.    AMENDATORY     40 O.S. 2011, Section 197.5, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 197.5. Every employer shall pay to each of his or her 
employees who have reached eighteen (18) years of age wages at a 
rate of not less than Two Dollars ($2.00) the federal minimum wa ge 
of Seven Dollars and twenty-five cents ($7.25) per hour on January 
1, 2021, until December 31, 2021.  Regardless of other provisions of 
the Oklahoma Minimum Wage Act, every Beginning January 1, 2022, the   
 
 
Req. No. 1261 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
state minimum wage shall be Eight Dollars and fifty cents ( $8.50) 
per hour.  Beginning on Janua ry 1, 2023, the state minimum wage 
shall be Nine Dollars and seventy-five cents ($9.75) per hour. 
Beginning on January 1, 2024, the state minimum wage shall be Eleven 
Dollars ($11.00) per hour.  Beginning January 1, 2025, the state 
minimum wage shall be Thirteen Dollars ($13.00) per hour.  Beginning 
January 1, 2026, the state minimum wage shall be Fifteen Dollars 
($15.00) per hour.  Beginning on January 1, 2027, and every January 
1 thereafter, the state minimum wage shall increase according to the 
Consumer Price Index (CPI) percentage increase from the prior year. 
Every employee of the State of Oklahoma or any lessee or 
concessionaire thereof is hereby specifically covered by the 
Oklahoma Minimum Wage Act and the minimum wage per hour set by this 
section. 
SECTION 4.  This act shall become effe ctive July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 5.  It being immediately necessary for the pr eservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
58-1-1261  1/11/2021 9:33:06 AM