Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
SCs changed Brooks, Weaver to Treat, Garvin, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Paxton, Coleman, Weaver, Jech, Brooks, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|