Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB334 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021