Senate | 05/20/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 9 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Paxton |