Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Hill | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Kendrix | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |