Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Kendrix
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Grego
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Boles, West (Kevin), CrosswhiteHader, Phillips, Kendrix, Russ
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Gann
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass States Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to States Rights
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Gann
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
remove as principal author Representative Gann and substitute with Representative Hill
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|