Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB39 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 02/25/2021

                             
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB39 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 24, 2021 
 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 39 	By: Thompson 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to state automobiles; amending 47 
O.S. 2011, Section 156, as amended by Section 2, 
Chapter 380, O.S.L. 2014 (47 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 
156), which relates to purchase of passenger 
automobiles with public funds; modi fying inclusions; 
updating statutory language; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY    47 O.S. 2011, Section 156, as 
amended by Section 2, Chapter 380, O.S.L. 2014 (47 O.S. Supp. 20 20, 
Section 156), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 156. A.  Unless otherwise provided for by law, no state 
board, commission, department, institution, official, or employee, 
except the following, shall purchase any pa ssenger automobile or bus 
with public funds: 
1.  The Department of Public Safety; 
2.  The Department of Human Services; 
3.  The State Department of Rehabilitation Services; 
4.  The Department of Wildlife Conservation; 
5.  The Department of Corrections;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB39 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
6.  The State Department of Education; 
7.  The Oklahoma School of Science and Mathematics; 
8.  The Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and D angerous Drugs 
Control; 
9. The Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; 
10.  The Transportation Commission; 
11.  The Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; 
12.  The State Department of Health; 
13.  The Department of Mental Health and Subst ance Abuse 
Services; 
14.  The J.D. McCarty Center for Children with Developmental 
Disabilities; 
15.  The Military Depart ment of the State of Oklahoma; 
16.  The Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department; 
17.  The Oklahoma Conservation Commission; 
18.  The Oklahoma Water Resources B oard; 
19.  The Department of Mines; 
20.  The Office of Juvenile Affairs; 
21.  The Oklahoma Dep artment of Veteran Affairs; 
22.  The Oklahoma Supreme Court; 
23.  The District Attorneys Counci l and Oklahoma district 
attorneys, provided adequate funding exists ; 
24.  The Oklahoma Boll Weevil Eradication Organization; and 
25.  The Oklahoma Horse Racing C ommission.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB39 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  1.  The Oklahoma School for the Deaf at Sulphur, the 
Oklahoma School for the Bli nd at Muskogee, and any state institution 
of higher education may p urchase, own, or keep if now owned, or 
acquire by lease or gift, and use and maintain such sta tion wagons, 
automobiles, trucks, or buses as are reasonably necessary for the 
implementation of the educational programs of said the institutions. 
2.  No bus operated, owned, or used by such educational 
institutions shall be permitted to carry any person othe r than 
students, faculty members, employees , or volunteers of such 
institutions.  The provi sions of this section shall not be constr ued 
to prohibit: 
a. the operation of intracampus buses or buses routed 
directly between portions of the campus of any 
institution not adjacent to each other, nor to 
prohibit the collection of fares from such student s, 
faculty members, or employees of such institutions, 
sufficient in amount to cover the reasonable cost of 
such transportation, or 
b. the Oklahoma School for the Bl ind or the Oklahoma 
School for the Deaf from entering into agreements with 
local public school districts pursuant to the 
Interlocal Cooperation Act for the mu tual use of the 
schools’ and the districts’ vehicles.  Such use may 
include, but is not limited to , the transportation of   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB39 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
students from local school districts with students 
from the Oklahoma School for the Blind or the Oklahoma 
School for the Deaf in vehic les owned by the Oklahoma 
School for the Blind or the Oklahoma School for the 
Deaf when traveling to school-related activities. 
C.  The J.D. McCarty Center for Children with Developmental 
Disabilities, the Oklahoma Department of L ibraries, the Oklahoma 
Department of Veterans Affairs, and the Oklahoma Veterans Centers 
may own and maintain such passenger vehicles as those institutions 
have acquired prior to May 1, 1981. 
D.  The use of station wagons, automobiles, and buses, other 
than as provided for in this section, shall be permitted only upon 
written request for such use by heads of departments of the 
institution, approved in writing by the president of said the 
institution or by some administrative official of said the 
institution authorized by the preside nt to grant said the approval.  
Such use shall be permitted only for official institutional business 
or activities connected therewith.  Such use shall be subject to the 
provisions of Section 156.1 of this title forbidding persona l use of 
such vehicles, and to the penalties therein declared. 
E.  Any person convicted of violating the provisions of this 
section shall be guilty of a misdemeanor and shall be punished by 
fine or imprisonment, or both, as provided for in Section 156.1 of 
this title.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB39 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
F.  For the purpose of this section and Section 156.3 of this 
title, a station wagon is classified as a passenger automobil e and 
may not be purchased solely for the use of transporting property.  
Such vehicles shall include, but not be limited to, all vehicles 
which have no separate luggage compartment or trunk but which do not 
have open beds, whether the same are called stati on wagons, vans, 
suburbans, town and country, blazers , or any other names.  All state 
boards, commissions, departments , and institutions may own a nd 
maintain station wagons purchased solely for the purpose of 
transporting property if acquired prior to July 1, 1985. 
G.  The provisions of this section and Section 156.1 of this 
title shall not apply to public officials who are statewide elected 
commissioners or statewide elected officials. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
February 24, 2021 - DO PASS