Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|