House | 04/15/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Coleman |