Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|