Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB405 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021