Senate | 04/27/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Boles | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Garvin |