Senate | 04/28/2021 | Vetoed 04/28/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 41; Ayes: 55 Nays: 41 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Waldron (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) |