Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2021