Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2020

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021