Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB421 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021