Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pfeiffer, Caldwell (Trey), Lowe (Dick), West (Rick), Moore, Dobrinski, Fetgatter, Mize, Strom, Vancuren, Grego, McCall, Baker, Culver, Frix, McDugle, Bashore, Boles, Hardin (David), Hilbert, Steagall
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Simpson, Murdock, Howard, Bullard, Boren, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kerbs
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Simpson
|
|
|