Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021