Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB425 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44 Req. No. 1179 Page 1 1
55 2
66 3
77 4
88 5
99 6
1010 7
1111 8
1212 9
1313 10
1414 11
1515 12
1616 13
1717 14
1818 15
1919 16
2020 17
2121 18
2222 19
2323 20
2424 21
2525 22
2626 23
2727 24
2828 1
2929 2
3030 3
3131 4
3232 5
3333 6
3434 7
3535 8
3636 9
3737 10
3838 11
3939 12
4040 13
4141 14
4242 15
4343 16
4444 17
4545 18
4646 19
4747 20
4848 21
4949 22
5050 23
5151 24
5252
5353 STATE OF OKLAHOMA
5454
5555 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021)
5656
5757 SENATE BILL 425 By: Hamilton
5858
5959
6060
6161
6262
6363 AS INTRODUCED
6464
6565 An Act relating to human trafficking and child
6666 exploitation; creating the Advisory Task Force on
6767 Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child
6868 Exploitation; providing for membership and
6969 appointments; stating duty to study hum an
7070 trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in
7171 Oklahoma; providing for recommendations and report;
7272 stating member appointment and initial meeting dates;
7373 setting term for task force; providing travel
7474 reimbursements; exempting advisory task force from
7575 Open Meetings Act; providing for noncodification;
7676 providing an effective date; and dec laring an
7777 emergency.
7878
7979
8080
8181 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF O KLAHOMA:
8282 SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law not to be
8383 codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows:
8484 There is hereby created an Advisory Task Force on Prevention of
8585 Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation. There shall be thirteen
8686 (13) members on the Advisory Task Force as follows:
8787 1. The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation,
8888 or a designee;
8989 2. The Oklahoma County District Attorney, or a designee;
9090 3. The Attorney General, or a designee;
9191
9292
9393 Req. No. 1179 Page 2 1
9494 2
9595 3
9696 4
9797 5
9898 6
9999 7
100100 8
101101 9
102102 10
103103 11
104104 12
105105 13
106106 14
107107 15
108108 16
109109 17
110110 18
111111 19
112112 20
113113 21
114114 22
115115 23
116116 24
117117 1
118118 2
119119 3
120120 4
121121 5
122122 6
123123 7
124124 8
125125 9
126126 10
127127 11
128128 12
129129 13
130130 14
131131 15
132132 16
133133 17
134134 18
135135 19
136136 20
137137 21
138138 22
139139 23
140140 24
141141
142142 4. Two members appointed by the President Pro Tempore of t he
143143 Senate who shall represent a victim assistance organization , a human
144144 trafficking prevention advocate or a member -at-large;
145145 5. Two members appointed by the Speaker of the House of
146146 Representatives who shall represent a child protection or child
147147 advocacy organization, a local law enforcement agency or a faith-
148148 based organization;
149149 6. Three Senators appointed by the President Pro Tempore of the
150150 Senate; and
151151 7. Three Representatives appointed by the Speaker of the Ho use
152152 of Representatives.
153153 The Advisory Task Force shall have the duty to study human
154154 trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in Oklahoma. The
155155 Advisory Task Force shall make recommendations to the Legislature on
156156 methods and laws to enhance and fund the efforts of law enforcement
157157 and/or community groups that are working to slow and stop
158158 prostitution, human trafficking or child exploitation; methods to
159159 assist in identifying and interrupting websites that promote
160160 pornography and sexually ex plicit materials; and methods that
161161 develop and support community groups working with victims to
162162 interrupt cycles of abuse or prevent human trafficking,
163163 prostitution, sexual abuse or other factors influential in
164164 perpetuating human trafficking, prostitution o r child exploitation.
165165
166166
167167 Req. No. 1179 Page 3 1
168168 2
169169 3
170170 4
171171 5
172172 6
173173 7
174174 8
175175 9
176176 10
177177 11
178178 12
179179 13
180180 14
181181 15
182182 16
183183 17
184184 18
185185 19
186186 20
187187 21
188188 22
189189 23
190190 24
191191 1
192192 2
193193 3
194194 4
195195 5
196196 6
197197 7
198198 8
199199 9
200200 10
201201 11
202202 12
203203 13
204204 14
205205 15
206206 16
207207 17
208208 18
209209 19
210210 20
211211 21
212212 22
213213 23
214214 24
215215
216216 The Advisory Task Force shall have members appointed by August
217217 1, 2021. The Advisory Task Force shall begin meeting and continue
218218 studying until January 1, 2022. A report of the findings a nd
219219 recommendations shall be presented to the P resident Pro Tempore of
220220 the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representat ives and the
221221 Governor on or before February 1, 2022. Upon delivery of the report
222222 the Advisory Task Force shall terminate.
223223 Members of the Legislature shall receive travel reimburseme nts
224224 from their respective appointing au thority. The Senate and House
225225 staff shall jointly assist in staffing the Advisory Task Force. A
226226 Senate member shall call the initial meeting by September 1, 2021.
227227 The chair of the Advisory Task Force shall be appointed by majority
228228 vote of the members.
229229 The Advisory Task Force shall be exempt from the Oklahoma Open
230230 Meeting Act.
231231 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2021.
232232 SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservati on
233233 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
234234 declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and
235235 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
236236
237237 58-1-1179 NP 1/15/2021 3:26:12 PM