Req. No. 1179 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) SENATE BILL 425 By: Hamilton AS INTRODUCED An Act relating to human trafficking and child exploitation; creating the Advisory Task Force on Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation; providing for membership and appointments; stating duty to study hum an trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in Oklahoma; providing for recommendations and report; stating member appointment and initial meeting dates; setting term for task force; providing travel reimbursements; exempting advisory task force from Open Meetings Act; providing for noncodification; providing an effective date; and dec laring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF O KLAHOMA: SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law not to be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: There is hereby created an Advisory Task Force on Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation. There shall be thirteen (13) members on the Advisory Task Force as follows: 1. The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, or a designee; 2. The Oklahoma County District Attorney, or a designee; 3. The Attorney General, or a designee; Req. No. 1179 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 4. Two members appointed by the President Pro Tempore of t he Senate who shall represent a victim assistance organization , a human trafficking prevention advocate or a member -at-large; 5. Two members appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives who shall represent a child protection or child advocacy organization, a local law enforcement agency or a faith- based organization; 6. Three Senators appointed by the President Pro Tempore of the Senate; and 7. Three Representatives appointed by the Speaker of the Ho use of Representatives. The Advisory Task Force shall have the duty to study human trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in Oklahoma. The Advisory Task Force shall make recommendations to the Legislature on methods and laws to enhance and fund the efforts of law enforcement and/or community groups that are working to slow and stop prostitution, human trafficking or child exploitation; methods to assist in identifying and interrupting websites that promote pornography and sexually ex plicit materials; and methods that develop and support community groups working with victims to interrupt cycles of abuse or prevent human trafficking, prostitution, sexual abuse or other factors influential in perpetuating human trafficking, prostitution o r child exploitation. Req. No. 1179 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 The Advisory Task Force shall have members appointed by August 1, 2021. The Advisory Task Force shall begin meeting and continue studying until January 1, 2022. A report of the findings a nd recommendations shall be presented to the P resident Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representat ives and the Governor on or before February 1, 2022. Upon delivery of the report the Advisory Task Force shall terminate. Members of the Legislature shall receive travel reimburseme nts from their respective appointing au thority. The Senate and House staff shall jointly assist in staffing the Advisory Task Force. A Senate member shall call the initial meeting by September 1, 2021. The chair of the Advisory Task Force shall be appointed by majority vote of the members. The Advisory Task Force shall be exempt from the Oklahoma Open Meeting Act. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservati on of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 58-1-1179 NP 1/15/2021 3:26:12 PM