Senate | 04/19/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Bush | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | remove as principal author Representative Bush and substitute with Representative Talley | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Stanley |