Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB45 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021