Senate | 03/10/2021 | Motion expired | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Rader | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 16 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rader | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |