House | 04/07/2021 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Remove as coauthor Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Daniels |