House
|
04/21/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Miller
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|