Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |