Senate | 02/28/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Rosino | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator McCortney | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |