Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2021