Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Frix
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
remove as principal author Representative Frix and substitute with Representative Sterling
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Bergstrom, Standridge, Murdock, Coleman, Matthews, Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|