Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Vetoed 05/16/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Rescind advancement from General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|