Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022