House
|
04/22/2021
|
Motion expired
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Townley
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 58
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Adoption of floor substitute rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
CR; Do Pass States Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to States Rights
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Remove as principal author Representative Sneed and substitute with Representative Townley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|