Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2021