House | 03/30/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm |