Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/24/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|