Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 3, 2021