House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rader |