Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Approved by Governor 03/30/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Remove Senator Rosino as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Remove Representative West (Josh) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|