Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Smith, Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Luttrell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Bashore
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Steagall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Ford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on State Powers
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Kendrix
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Russ
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
SCs named Bullard, Pugh, Pemberton, Stanley, Dugger, Dossett (J.J.), Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Roe
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Frix
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Kidd, Pemberton, Rogers, Dugger
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin), CrosswhiteHader, Stearman, West (Josh), Conley, Randleman, Moore, Boles, Talley
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute State Powers Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to State Powers
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Williams (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|