Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB615 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022